Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jude Thaddeus Okolo

Apostolic Nuncio to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Novica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1956 Born
2 Jul 198326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
9 Nov 200144.8IncardinatedPriest of Nnewi, Nigeria
2 Aug 200851.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novica
2 Aug 200851.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
2 Aug 200851.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chad
27 Sep 200851.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Novica
7 Oct 201356.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
7 Oct 201356.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
13 May 201760.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland

MicroData Summary for Jude Thaddeus Okolo
Archbishop Jude Thaddeus Okolo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ireland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKano, Nigeria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Ireland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,964
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Aug 2017