Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Theodorus Lumanauw

Deceased

Archbishop of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1922Born
7 Jul 194624.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 197351.2AppointedBishop of Makassar, Indonesia
22 Sep 197351.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia
18 May 198159.0DiedArchbishop of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Lumanauw
Archbishop Theodorus Lumanauw (born , died ) Archbishop of Ujung Pandang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTondano

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast