Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilson Abraham Moncayo Jalil

Deceased

Bishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1944BornAmbato
23 Aug 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Latacunga, Ecuador
11 May 200257.6AppointedBishop of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador
22 Jun 200257.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador
12 Mar 201267.5DiedBishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Wilson Abraham Moncayo Jalil:
Bishop Wilson Abraham Moncayo Jalil (born , died ) Bishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • N: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2009
  • d: CB, 12 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,205
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013