Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Ferrofino

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ecuador

Titular Archbishop of Zenopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1912Born
22 Sep 193422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
8 Feb 196047.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
28 Oct 196149.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
26 Nov 196149.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
3 Nov 196553.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
29 Sep 197058.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
20 Dec 201098.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ferrofino
Archbishop Giovanni Ferrofino (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Ecuador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria

  • a priest for 76.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast