Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Moke Motsüri

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kinshasa

Titular Bishop of Lestrona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1916BornMongobele
9 Jun 194630.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 197054.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 197054.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lestrona
6 Dec 197054.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lestrona
11 May 199175.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Apr 201599.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Eugène Moke Motsüri:
Bishop Eugène Moke Motsüri (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kinshasa

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015