Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vito Rallo

Apostolic Nuncio to Morocco

Titular Archbishop of Alba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1953 BornMazara del Vallo, Italy
1 Apr 197925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
12 Jun 200754.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Alba
12 Jun 200754.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
12 Jun 200754.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
28 Oct 200754.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Alba
15 Jan 201561.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio
12 Dec 201562.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Morocco

MicroData Summary for Vito Rallo:
Archbishop Vito Rallo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Morocco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Morocco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,559
  • r: CB, 20 Feb 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 12 Dec 2015