Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Themba Mngoma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mariannhill


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1941BornMariathal
4 Jul 197129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mariannhill, South Africa
12 Feb 198139.1AppointedBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
23 May 198139.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
25 May 198139.4InstalledBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
7 Feb 200563.1ResignedBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
15 Jun 200563.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mariannhill, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Paul Themba Mngoma:
Bishop Paul Themba Mngoma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mariannhill

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015