Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Maxence Péronne

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1823BornLaon
9 Jun 183814.6Ordained PriestPriest of Soissons (-Laon), France
10 Jul 188460.7SelectedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
13 Nov 188461.0ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
14 Dec 188461.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
20 Feb 189268.3DiedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Maxence Péronne:
Bishop Joseph-Maxence Péronne (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013