Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joannes-Henricus Cardinal von Frankenberg

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1726Born
21 Sep 174822.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Aug 174922.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 175932.6AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
15 Jul 175932.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
1 Jun 177851.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 180175.1ResignedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
11 Jun 180477.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Joannes-Henricus von Frankenberg
Joannes-Henricus Cardinal von Frankenberg (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGross-Glogau

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
  • a cardinal for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast