Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Calini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crema

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1696BornCalino
17 Dec 171822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
11 Sep 173034.6AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
21 Sep 173034.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
27 Jan 175155.0ResignedBishop of Crema, Italy
1 Feb 175155.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
26 Sep 176670.7Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176670.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
Oct 1767³71.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
4 Mar 177175.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
9 Dec 178286.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Calini (VIAF: 56841479)
Ludovico Cardinal Calini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crema

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 52.2 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016