Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Maria Martin von Stegner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1710³BornWien
19 Sep 173322.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Jan 173423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Mar 177867.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Mar 177867.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
3 May 177867.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
28 May 177867.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Maria Martin von Stegner:
Bishop Anton Maria Martin von Stegner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015