Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál László Esterházy

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1730Born
27 May 175221.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Mar 175322.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 177646.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
16 Sep 177646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
28 Oct 177646.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
16 Feb 178150.7SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
2 Apr 178150.8ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
7 Nov 179969.4DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Pál László Esterházy
Bishop Pál László Esterházy (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFelsopaty

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 351, and Page 371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast