Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anton Gall

Deceased

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1748Born
13 Jun 177224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
12 May 178840.1SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
15 Dec 178840.7ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
8 Feb 178940.8Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
1 Mar 178940.9InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
18 Jun 180759.2DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anton Gall
Bishop Joseph Anton Gall (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeil der Stadt

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 6
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018