Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Dwertitsch (Dvertisch)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1715BornSiendorf
22 Mar 173823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 Mar 173823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Jul 177560.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Jul 177560.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
6 Aug 177560.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
8 Feb 177863.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Adam Dwertitsch (Dvertisch):
Bishop Adam Dwertitsch (Dvertisch) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 327, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015