Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Zerdahely

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1742BornNyitraszerdahely
22 Dec 176422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Mar 176522.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 178038.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
11 Dec 178038.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Titopolis
14 Jan 178138.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titopolis
16 Aug 180057.8SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
22 Dec 180058.1ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
5 Oct 181370.9DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Zerdahely:
Bishop Gabriel Zerdahely (born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 409, and Page 453
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015