Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ádám Patačić de Zajezda

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1716³BornS. Martin de Hermeties
7 Dec 173822.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 173822.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 175943.6SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
28 Jan 176044.0ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
9 Mar 176044.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
8 Mar 177660.1SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
16 Sep 177660.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
19 Jul 178468.5DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ádám Patačić de Zajezda:
Archbishop Ádám Patačić de Zajezda (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015