Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David O’Leary, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1880BornKimberley
10 Jul 191029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
13 May 192544.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Transvaal, South Africa
13 May 192544.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
8 Sep 192545.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
25 Nov 195070.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Transvaal, South Africa
12 Aug 195878.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for David O’Leary:
Bishop David O’Leary O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013