Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kimberley

Dioecesis Kimberleyensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Abel Gabuza, Bishop
  • Erwin Hecht, O.M.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bloemfontein
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 123,083 (47,540 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 20 Dalham Road, P.O. Box 309, Kimberley 8300, South Africa
  • Telephone: (053)831.18.61/2
  • Fax: 831.18.63

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange
4 June 1886ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Natal
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange (erected)
8 May 1894Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange Prefecture Apostolic of Basutoland (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
1918Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
26 November 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Kroonstad (erected)
9 April 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Transvaal
Vicariate Apostolic of Pretoria (erected)
11 January 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Aliwal
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
Archdiocese of Bloemfontein (erected)
Diocese of Kimberley
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale} Diocese of Kimberley
2 April 1959Territory LostDiocese of Bulawayo
Diocese of Kimberley
Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
Prefecture Apostolic of Bechuanaland (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in South Africa {nell’Africa Meridionale}
195032,727691,6494.7%3939839781524ap1951
Diocese of Kimberley
196951,803137381,36373893ap1971
198066,835565,00011.8%325282,38641754ap1981
199093,948707,00013.3%321243,91438424ap1991
1999113,2701,502,2307.5%1814323,53919348ap2000
2000117,3551,603,7607.3%1715323,667202715ap2001
2001118,7301,607,3507.4%1414284,240192816ap2002
2002119,6901,690,4807.1%1412264,603162116ap2003
2003119,7801,730,6806.9%1315284,277192016ap2004
2004117,3351,740,0006.7%1616323,666202617ap2005
2006117,2601,780,0006.6%1918373,169222517ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Apr 2013