Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félicien Bocon de La Merlière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apt, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1715Born
6 Jan 175236.7SelectedBishop of Apt, France
15 May 175237.1ConfirmedBishop of Apt, France
4 Jun 175237.1Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
11 Dec 177863.6ResignedBishop of Apt, France
26 Oct 178873.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Apt, France

MicroData Summary for Félicien Bocon de La Merlière
Bishop Félicien Bocon de La Merlière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMerlière

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast