Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Bouhier

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1683BornDijon
8 Sep 174360.4SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
16 Dec 174360.6ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
26 Jan 174460.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
21 Jun 175572.2DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Bouhier:
Bishop Claude Bouhier (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015