Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Cavero y Tormo

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1882Born
9 Jun 190624.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 194462.5AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
24 Feb 194562.7Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
10 Apr 194966.8DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Cavero y Tormo
Bishop Francisco Cavero y Tormo (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurcia

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast