Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de los Santos Díaz y Gómara

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1885Born
18 Jul 190924.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 192035.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
8 Jul 192035.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
21 Dec 192035.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora
18 Dec 192439.4AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
28 Jan 193549.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
8 Mar 193953.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barcelona, Spain
30 Dec 194257.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Barcelona, Spain
7 Nov 194964.3DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Miguel de los Santos Díaz y Gómara
Bishop Miguel de los Santos Díaz y Gómara (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFitero

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast