Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Filippini

Bishop of Pescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1948 BornVinci
14 Apr 197324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
25 Nov 201567.4AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
3 Jan 201667.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
24 Jan 201667.6InstalledBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Filippini
Bishop Roberto Filippini (born ) Bishop of Pescia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pescia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 27 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016