Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josafá Menezes da Silva

Archbishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1959 Born
14 May 198930.3Ordained PriestPriest of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
12 Jan 200546.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
12 Jan 200546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
10 Mar 200546.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
15 Dec 201051.9AppointedBishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
9 Oct 201960.7AppointedArchbishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
14 Dec 201960.9InstalledArchbishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Josafá Menezes da Silva
Archbishop Josafá Menezes da Silva (born ) Archbishop of Vitória da Conquista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalinas da Margarida, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
Ordained BishopColégio Antônio Vieira, Salvador, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,832
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 11 Oct 2019

Quantcast