Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregório (Leozírio) Paixão Neto, O.S.B.

Bishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1964 Born
7 Dec 198622.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jun 199227.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Mar 199328.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Jun 200641.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
7 Jun 200641.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
29 Jul 200641.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus
10 Oct 201247.9AppointedBishop of Petrópolis, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gregório (Leozírio) Paixão Neto
Bishop Gregório (Leozírio) Paixão Neto O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Petrópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAracaju

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Petrópolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,215
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast