Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eraldo Bispo da Silva

Bishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1966 Born
24 Apr 199326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
7 Nov 201246.2AppointedBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
27 Dec 201246.3Ordained BishopBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
16 Feb 201346.5InstalledBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eraldo Bispo da Silva
Bishop Eraldo Bispo da Silva (born ) Bishop of Patos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Patos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 19 Nov 2012
  • c2: CB, 20 Dec 2012
  • c34: CB, 27 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,617

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast