Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes da Silva Ferreira

Deceased

Bishop of Tanger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1675BornLinhares
26 Dec 171541.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 174267.9AppointedBishop of Tanger, Morocco
9 Jun 174368.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tanger, Morocco
19 Jan 1775100.0DiedBishop of Tanger, Morocco

MicroData Summary for Joannes da Silva Ferreira:
Bishop Joannes da Silva Ferreira (died ) Bishop of Tanger

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013