Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severino Batista de França, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1945 BornBezeros
8 Dec 196722.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Dec 197227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Aug 200459.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
4 Aug 200459.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
7 Oct 200459.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
7 Mar 200762.1AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
15 Apr 200762.2InstalledBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
25 Nov 201570.8ResignedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Severino Batista de França
Bishop Severino Batista de França O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nazaré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,703
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2007
  • i: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016