Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Bernard Brinkmann

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1813Born
25 May 183926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
6 Apr 187057.1SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
27 Jun 187057.3ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
4 Oct 187057.6Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
13 Apr 188976.1DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Bernard Brinkmann (VIAF: 52488750)
Bishop Johannes Bernard Brinkmann (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEverswinkel, Diocese of Münster
Ordained BishopMünster, Diocese of Münster

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017