Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad Martin

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1812BornGeismar
27 Feb 183623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
29 Jan 185643.7SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Jun 185644.1ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
17 Aug 185644.2Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
16 Jul 187967.2DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad Martin:
Bishop Konrad Martin (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013