Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso María Buteler

Deceased

Archbishop of Mendoza, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1892Born
28 Oct 191523.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 194048.0AppointedBishop of Mendoza, Argentina
1 Dec 194048.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mendoza, Argentina
21 Dec 194048.2InstalledBishop of Mendoza, Argentina
10 Apr 196168.5AppointedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
30 Sep 197381.0DiedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alfonso María Buteler
Archbishop Alfonso María Buteler (born , died ) Archbishop of Mendoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Molinos

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast