Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James William McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1853Born
4 May 187926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
25 May 191461.3AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Jun 191461.3Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Dec 194390.9DiedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James William McCarthy
Bishop James William McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewcastle-upon-Tyne, Diocese of Hexham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Pro-Cathedral, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Andrew, Cemetery, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 31
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast