Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Toner

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1857BornGlasgow
25 Mar 188225.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 191457.4AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Oct 191457.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
31 May 194992.2DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Toner
Bishop John Toner (born , died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016