Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Charles McDonald

Deceased

Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1840Born
4 Jun 187332.9Ordained PriestPriest of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
13 Jun 189049.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
13 Jun 189049.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
28 Aug 189050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
1 May 189150.8SucceededBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
1 Dec 191272.4DiedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Charles McDonald (VIAF: 317273976)
Bishop James Charles McDonald (born , died ) Bishop of Charlottetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllisary, Diocese of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island
Ordained BishopS. Dunstan, Charlottetown, Diocese of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017