Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Idiofa

Dioecesis Idiofaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Moko Ekanga, P.S.S., Bishop
  • Louis Mbwôl-Mpasi, O.M.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ipamu
13 April 1937ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
Prefecture Apostolic of Ipamu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ipamu
12 February 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ipamu Vicariate Apostolic of Ipamu
Diocese of Ipamu
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ipamu Diocese of Ipamu
Diocese of Idiofa
20 June 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Ipamu Diocese of Idiofa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ipamu
195061,765350,00017.6%254561,102512513ap1951
Diocese of Ipamu
Diocese of Idiofa
1969186,067425,00043.8%172199,793115420ap1971
1980382,000794,00048.1%2523487,958516129ap1981
1990443,395839,32652.8%6912815,47412859036ap1991
1999271,623637,57542.6%87191062,5627610249ap2000
2000283,329651,61443.5%94251192,380849854ap2001
2001294,275737,63839.9%81261072,7505910743ap2002
2002245,359711,62134.5%79211002,45354310740ap2003
2003426,075949,17544.9%84221064,0193910840ap2004
2004600,0001,000,00060.0%7920996,0603611742ap2005
20061,100,0002,200,00050.0%871910610,3773111742ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013