Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Nganga a Ndzando

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lisala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1923BornNdeke Mabela
22 Feb 195330.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Apr 196138.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Apr 196138.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
9 Jul 196138.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
25 Nov 196441.9AppointedBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Jul 199774.5RetiredBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Feb 201491.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Louis Nganga a Ndzando:
Bishop Louis Nganga a Ndzando (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lisala

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Feb 2014