Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul-François Le Févre de Caumartin

Deceased

Bishop of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1668BornChâlons sur Marne
1693¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 171748.7SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
8 Jun 171849.4ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
17 Jul 171849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
27 Aug 171950.6SelectedBishop of Blois, France
4 Mar 172051.2ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
30 Aug 173364.7DiedBishop of Blois, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul-François Le Févre de Caumartin:
Bishop Jean-Paul-François Le Févre de Caumartin (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122, and Page 408
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015