Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino Miguel Fernández Pérez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Marcos, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1895Born
28 Feb 192024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Nov 195560.0AppointedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
6 Jan 195660.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
7 Dec 197176.0RetiredBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
20 Feb 197276.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Marcos, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Celestino Miguel Fernández Pérez
Bishop Celestino Miguel Fernández Pérez O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Marcos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVélez-Rubio, Spain

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast