Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Verapaz, Cobán

Dioecesis Verae Pacis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Verapaz and Petén
27 July 1921ErectedArchdiocese of Guatemala Vicariate Apostolic of Verapaz and Petén (erected)
Diocese of Verapaz, Cobán
14 January 1935ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Verapaz and Petén Diocese of Verapaz, Cobán
10 March 1951Territory LostDiocese of Verapaz, Cobán Apostolic Administration of El Petén (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Verapaz, Cobán
1949389,550390,00099.9%35848,69314ap1951
1963360,200400,00090.0%3211438,37623ap1967
1970358,860.0%432360373415ap1971
1976323,400383,27984.4%533388,510384829ap1977
1980435,000490,00088.8%737449,886436326ap1981
1990613,200730,00084.0%10374713,0464610828ap1991
1999908,6001,040,60087.3%22456713,56115714932ap2000
2000865,0001,017,73285.0%26457112,1835714932ap2001
2001866,0001,018,83485.0%26457112,1975714932ap2002
2002844,8961,056,12180.0%21426313,41115016032ap2003
2003844,8961,056,12180.0%19436213,62715116032ap2004
2004844,9961,056,12180.0%28437111,90115016032ap2005
20101,119,0001,318,00084.9%26335918,9661408734ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013