Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Makarakiza, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gitega


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1919BornRudehe
16 Aug 195132.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
21 Aug 196142.1AppointedBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
8 Dec 196142.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
5 Sep 196849.2AppointedArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi
6 Nov 198263.4ResignedArchbishop of Gitega, Burundi
17 Apr 200484.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gitega, Burundi

MicroData Summary for André Makarakiza:
Archbishop André Makarakiza M. Afr. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gitega

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013