Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Friteau, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loango, Congo

Titular Bishop of Iabruda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1884Born
24 Sep 191025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Mar 192237.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Loango, Congo
22 Mar 192237.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Iabruda
6 Aug 192237.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iabruda
4 Apr 194661.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Loango, Congo
17 May 195671.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loango, Congo

MicroData Summary for Henri Friteau
Bishop Henri Friteau C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Étienne-en-Coglès, France

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 Jul 2018

Quantcast