Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Rodríguez Carballo, O.F.M.

Secretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Titular Archbishop of Bellicastrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1953 BornLodoselo, Spain
9 Aug 197118.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 197623.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 197723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 Jun 200349.8AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
6 Apr 201359.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
6 Apr 201359.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
18 May 201359.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum

MicroData Summary for José Rodríguez Carballo:
Archbishop José Rodríguez Carballo O.F.M. (born ) Secretary of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Apr 2013
  • c34: CB, 18 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,788

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013