Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino Siuri Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1654BornElche
3 Oct 170854.4AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
25 Feb 170954.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
1 Oct 171763.4AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
28 Jan 173176.8DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Siuri Navarro:
Bishop Marcelino Siuri Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013