Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal de Salazar Gutiérrez de Toledo, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630²Born
1664²34.0AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1670²40.0ResignedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
2 Jun 168151.4AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
21 Sep 168151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
2 Sep 168656.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 168656.7AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
14 Nov 168959.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
15 Aug 170676.6DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Salazar Gutiérrez de Toledo
Pedro Cardinal de Salazar Gutiérrez de Toledo O. de M. (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 221, Number 1,372
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast