Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de la Torre Orumbela

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
3 Oct 170158.7AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
21 Dec 170158.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
6 Jan 171269.0DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de la Torre Orumbela
Bishop José de la Torre Orumbela (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrihuela

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 21, Number 12
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast