Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo del Valle Ledesma

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1650³Born
23 Dec 171363.5SelectedBishop of Almería, Spain
21 Mar 171463.8ConfirmedBishop of Almería, Spain
15 Jul 171565.1Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
12 Nov 1722³72.4DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo del Valle Ledesma
Bishop Jerónimo del Valle Ledesma (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucena
Ordained BishopVelex et Rubio

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 30, Number 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,948

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast