Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Antonio Cardinal Belluga y Moncada, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1662BornMotril
9 Feb 170542.2AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
19 Apr 170542.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
29 Nov 171957.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172158.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
11 Sep 172461.8ResignedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Feb 172663.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
16 Dec 173775.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
3 Sep 173875.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
22 Feb 174380.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Belluga y Moncada:
Cardinal Luis Antonio Belluga y Moncada C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 37.8 years
  • a cardinal for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 24, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 22 Oct 2013