Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Febei

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹BornOrvieto
11 Jul 168360.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 168360.5AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
25 Jul 168360.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
14 Apr 168865.2DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Febei:
Bishop Giambattista Febei (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 4.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015