Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Innico Cardinal Caracciolo (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1642Born
25 Feb 169754.6AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
24 Mar 169754.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
29 May 171572.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Dec 171573.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 171673.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
6 Sep 173088.1DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Innico Caracciolo (Jr.) (VIAF: 89707206)
Innico Cardinal Caracciolo (Jr.) (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Martini, Martina Franca, Archdiocese of Taranto
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSant'Agata ai Monti, Monastery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria della Vittoria, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Santissimo Sacramento Chapel, Cathedral, Aversa, Diocese of Aversa

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 May 1715
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 10
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 237
  • ~nunc: AT, 22 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 Jul 2018

Quantcast