Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal de Angelis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1610BornPisa
20 Sep 166049.9AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
166756.2ResignedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
2 Sep 168675.9Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168676.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
15 Sep 169584.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo de Angelis:
Cardinal Giacomo de Angelis (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Urbino

  • a cardinal for 9.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013